EP0192673 - WORK STATION PROTECTION DEVICE FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF MANUAL OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAUSER, Bernhard Stöckachstrasse 56 D-8702 Eisingen / DE | [1986/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Pöhner Scharfenberger & Partner Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, Dr. Kaiserstrasse 27 Postfach 63 23 D-97013 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85904086.7 | 09.08.1985 | [1986/36] | WO1985DE00268 | Priority number, date | DE19843430224 | 17.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430224 | [1986/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601134 | Date: | 27.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0192673 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0192673 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B08B15/02, A61C19/00 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
A61C19/007 (EP);
B08B15/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/36] | Title | German: | ARBEITSPLATZSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHFÜHREN MANUELLER ARBEITEN | [1986/36] | English: | WORK STATION PROTECTION DEVICE FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF MANUAL OPERATIONS | [1986/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION D'UN POSTE DE TRAVAIL POUR L'EXECUTION D'OPERATIONS MANUELLES | [1986/36] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1986 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 10.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 14.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.12.1987 | 31.08.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.05.1989 | GB | 10.05.1989 | NL | 10.05.1989 | SE | 10.05.1989 | CH | 31.08.1989 | LI | 31.08.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1990/42] | GB | 10.05.1989 | |
NL | 10.05.1989 | ||
SE | 10.05.1989 | ||
CH | 31.08.1989 | ||
LI | 31.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/31] | NL | 10.05.1989 | |
SE | 10.05.1989 | ||
CH | 31.08.1989 | ||
LI | 31.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/11] | NL | 10.05.1989 | |
SE | 10.05.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 10.05.1989 | Cited in | International search | US4059903 [ ] (PIET MEYER, et al); | CH448439 [ ] (TECLAB S A R L [FR]); | DE527639 [ ] (ALBERT OLTERSDORF); | DE423479 [ ] (ALMA NIEFIND) |