EP0193610 - WIRE CUTTING DISCHARGE PROCESSING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/37] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASO, Toshiyuki Fanuc Hino Shataku 208 3-27, Tamadaira, Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 02 /
KINOSHITA, Hiroshi 3-27, Tamadaida Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | [1986/37] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1986/37] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK Suite 301 Sunlight House Quay Street Manchester M3 3JY / GB | Application number, filing date | 85904144.4 | 16.08.1985 | [1986/37] | WO1985JP00458 | Priority number, date | JP19840176702 | 27.08.1984 Original published format: JP 17670284 | [1986/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601445 | Date: | 13.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0193610 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193610 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/02 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
B23H7/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/37] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDDRAHTFUNKEROSIONSBEARBEITUNG | [1986/37] | English: | WIRE CUTTING DISCHARGE PROCESSING MACHINE | [1986/37] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA DECHARGE D'UN FIL DE COUPE | [1986/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1986 | Translation filed | 06.05.1986 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1986 | Search fee paid | 06.05.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [P]JPH0694222 (RINNAI KK); | [A]JPH05518306 ; | [A]JPS55160735U | Examination | EP0160104 |