EP0191827 - METHOD OF REMOVING N-TERMINAL AMINO ACID RESIDUES FROM EUCARYOTIC POLYPETIDE ANALOGS AND POLYPEPTIDES PRODUCED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO-TECHNOLOGY GENERAL CORPORATION 375 Park Avenue, Suite 3303 New York New York 10152 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/35] | For all designated states BIO-TECHNOLOGY GENERAL CORPORATION 375 Park Avenue, Suite 3303 New York New York 10152 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUMBERG, Shmaryahu 8 Baron Hirsh Street Rishon Le-Zion / IL | 02 /
BEN MEIR, Daniela 20 Tel Hai Street Ramat-Gan / IL | [1986/35] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/35] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85904198.0 | 09.08.1985 | [1986/35] | WO1985US01531 | Priority number, date | US19840641488 | 16.08.1984 Original published format: US 641488 | [1986/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601229 | Date: | 27.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0191827 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191827 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
C12P21/06 (EP);
C07K14/555 (EP);
C07K14/61 (EP);
C12N9/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON N-ENDAMINOSÄURERESTEN AUS EUKARYOTPOLYPEPTIDANLAGEN UND SO ERZEUGTE POLYPEPTIDE | [1986/35] | English: | METHOD OF REMOVING N-TERMINAL AMINO ACID RESIDUES FROM EUCARYOTIC POLYPETIDE ANALOGS AND POLYPEPTIDES PRODUCED THEREBY | [1986/35] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DES ACIDES AMINES RESIDUELS A TERMINAL N D'ANALOGUES POLYPEPTIDES EUCARYOTES ET POLYPEPTIDES OBTENUS PAR CE PROCEDE | [1986/35] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/43: Teilanmeldung 92101249.8 eingereicht am 09/08/85 | EPB 1992/43: Divisional application 92101249.8 filed on 09/08/85 | EPB 1992/43: Demande divisionnaire 92101249.8 déposée le 09/08/85 | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.1986 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1986 | Search fee paid | 07.05.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/40] | 21.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92101249.8 / EP0489711 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8604609 [ ] (NORDISK GENTOFTE [DK]); | EP0204527 [ ] (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) | International search | EP0020290 [ ] (SCHERING AG [DE]); | WO8402351 [ ] (NORDISK INSULINLAB [DK]) |