EP0221079 - PESTLE-TYPE GRINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. KURT RETSCH GmbH & Co. KG Rheinische Strasse 36 42781 Haan / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states F. KURT RETSCH GmbH & Co. KG Rheinische Strasse 36 D-42781 Haan / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIJSLING, Peter Isarstrasse 29 D-4006 Erkrath 2 / DE | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [1987/21] | Kühnemann, Klaus Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Kühnemann Dr.-Ing. Karl-Ernst Müller Sonderburgstrasse 36 D-4000 Düsseldorf 11 / DE | ||
Former [1987/20] | Kühnemann, Klaus Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Kühnemann Dr.-Ing. Karl-Ernst Müller Sonderburgstrasse 36 D-4000 Düsseldorf 11 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85904222.8 | 14.08.1985 | [1987/20] | WO1985DE00274 | Priority number, date | DE19843430047 | 16.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430047 | [1987/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601129 | Date: | 27.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221079 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B02C19/08 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
B02C19/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/20] | Title | German: | MÖRSERMÜHLE | [1987/20] | English: | PESTLE-TYPE GRINDER | [1987/20] | French: | BROYEUR A PILON | [1987/20] | File destroyed: | 18.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1987 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 12.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 01.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/02] | 08.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]SU816545 ; | DE2914170 [ ]; | US3384353 [ ]; | US2837320 [ ]; | US3539155 [ ]; | DE1507542 [ ]; | DE1782168 [ ]; | GB1289122 [ ] | [X] - Soviet Inventions Illustrated, Derwent Publications Ltd., WOCHE E, 17 February 1982, Abstract A1616, E/01 & SU, A, 816545 (Nucl. Geophys. Geoche) 05-04-1981, & SU816545 A 00000000 |