EP0193556 - OPTICAL KEYBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.1987 [1987/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOULOUMIAC, Alain 29, rue du Général Brunet F-75019 Paris / FR | [1986/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/37] | Application number, filing date | 85904263.2 | 09.09.1985 | [1986/37] | WO1985FR00239 | Priority number, date | FR19840013810 | 07.09.1984 Original published format: FR 8413810 | FR19840017588 | 19.11.1984 Original published format: FR 8417588 | FR19850008944 | 13.06.1985 Original published format: FR 8508944 | [1986/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601954 | Date: | 27.03.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0193556 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/969 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
H03K17/969 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/37] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE TASTATUR | [1986/37] | English: | OPTICAL KEYBOARD | [1986/37] | French: | CLAVIER OPTIQUE | [1986/37] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 12.08.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/14] | 09.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1987/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.06.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 09.06.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 09.06.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 09.06.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 09.06.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 09.06.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 09.06.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 09.06.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 09.06.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 09.06.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.09.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3648050 [ ]; | US3856127 [ ]; | US4417824 [ ]; | EP0054644 [ ]; | WO8100773 [ ] | [X] - Computer Design, Vol. 21, No. 3, March 1982 (Winchester, Mass. US) EIDSMORE: "Keystrokes Detected by Interrupting light-Beams in low Profile Keyboard", pages 66-67 see figures 1,2; right hand column, line 27 - page 70line 19 | [X] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 17, No. 3, August 1974 (New York, US) UBERBACHER: "Optical Keyboard", pages 822-823, see figures 1,3: page 822, line 1 - page 823line 7 | [A] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 23, No. 11, April 1981 (New York, US) DUNCAN et al.: "Optical Keyboard", pages 4998-4999see figures; pages 4998-4999 |