EP0195787 - DEVICE FOR SECURING A RECORDING DISC, PARTICULARLY A COMPACT DISC AGAINST THEFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1990 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lift Verkaufsgeräte-Gesellschaft m.b.H. Franzensgasse 25 A-1050 Wien / AT | [1986/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUBERT, Otto Franzensgasse 25 A-1050 Wien / AT | [1986/40] | Representative(s) | Weinzinger, Arnulf, et al Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | Weinzinger, Arnulf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 85904577.5 | 18.09.1985 | [1986/40] | WO1985AT00031 | Priority number, date | AT19840003029 | 24.09.1984 Original published format: AT 302984 | [1986/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601929 | Date: | 27.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195787 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195787 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/04, G11B23/02, A47F3/00 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
E05B73/0017 (EP,US);
G11B33/0427 (EP,US);
Y10S206/807 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/40] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR SICHERUNG EINER AUFZEICHNUNGSPLATTE, INSBESONDERE CD-PLATTE, GEGEN EINE UNBEFUGTE ENTNAHME | [1986/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR SECURING A RECORDING DISC, PARTICULARLY A COMPACT DISC AGAINST THEFT | [1986/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ASSURER UN DISQUE D'ENREGISTREMENT EN PARTICULIER UN DISQUE COMPACT, CONTRE LE VOL | [1986/40] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1986 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 11.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.05.1989 | FR | 17.05.1989 | GB | 17.05.1989 | IT | 17.05.1989 | NL | 17.05.1989 | SE | 17.05.1989 | CH | 30.09.1989 | LI | 30.09.1989 | LU | 30.09.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 17.05.1989 | |
GB | 17.05.1989 | ||
IT | 17.05.1989 | ||
NL | 17.05.1989 | ||
SE | 17.05.1989 | ||
CH | 30.09.1989 | ||
LI | 30.09.1989 | ||
LU | 30.09.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 17.05.1989 | |
GB | 17.05.1989 | ||
IT | 17.05.1989 | ||
NL | 17.05.1989 | ||
SE | 17.05.1989 | ||
CH | 30.09.1989 | ||
LI | 30.09.1989 | ||
Former [1991/08] | BE | 17.05.1989 | |
GB | 17.05.1989 | ||
NL | 17.05.1989 | ||
SE | 17.05.1989 | ||
CH | 30.09.1989 | ||
LI | 30.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/45] | GB | 17.05.1989 | |
NL | 17.05.1989 | ||
SE | 17.05.1989 | ||
CH | 30.09.1989 | ||
LI | 30.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 17.05.1989 | |
NL | 17.05.1989 | ||
SE | 17.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/11] | NL | 17.05.1989 | |
SE | 17.05.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 17.05.1989 | Cited in | International search | US3582169 [ ] (KOENIG JOHN B); | US3858280 [ ] (MARTENS MARTIN A J); | DE2539035 [ ] (JANK WILHELM); | US4075618 [ ] (MONTEAN SAMUEL); | DE2918783 [ ] (SCHLUETER PETER); | US4254879 [ ] (MAULE WARREN); | WO8402422 [ ] (WETTLE PER) |