EP0195789 - AN ELECTRONIC APPARATUS OR COMPONENT AND A METHOD OF PROVIDING SUCH AN APPARATUS OR COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1990 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.11.1990 [1990/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORNO A/S Artillerivej 126 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1986/40] | For all designated states STORNO A/S Artillerivej 126 DK-2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUGCU, Mehmet Rhodesiavej 6 DK-2770 Kastrup / DK | [1986/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/40] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85904611.2 | 17.09.1985 | [1986/40] | WO1985DK00089 | Priority number, date | DK19840004451 | 18.09.1984 Original published format: DK 445184 | [1986/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601969 | Date: | 27.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195789 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195789 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
H05K9/0037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/40] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ODER KOMPONENTE UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1986/40] | English: | AN ELECTRONIC APPARATUS OR COMPONENT AND A METHOD OF PROVIDING SUCH AN APPARATUS OR COMPONENT | [1986/40] | French: | APPAREIL OU COMPOSANT ELECTRONIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL APPAREIL OU COMPOSANT | [1986/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1986 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 21.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3445161 [ ]; | DE3447347 [ ]; | GB2123216 [ ]; | SE391105 [ ]; | US4370700 [ ]; | GB2101811 [ ]; | US3721746 [ ]; | US3816911 [ ] |