EP0194298 - INSTALLATION FOR MUSCULAR STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.1987 [1987/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERTHELIN, Francis 187, corniche J.F. Kennedy F-13007 Marseille / FR | [1986/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/38] | Application number, filing date | 85904642.7 | 20.09.1985 | [1986/38] | WO1985FR00256 | Priority number, date | FR19840014456 | 20.09.1984 Original published format: FR 8414456 | [1986/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601733 | Date: | 27.03.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0194298 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
A61N1/36 (US);
A61N1/36003 (EP);
A61N1/36034 (EP,US);
A61N1/3601 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/38] | Title | German: | STIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG VON MUSKELN | [1986/38] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR MUSCULAR STIMULATION | [1986/38] | French: | INSTALLATION DE STIMULATION MUSCULAIRE | [1986/38] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/14] | 29.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1987/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.06.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 20.06.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.09.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0103490 [ ] (UNIV WRIGHT STATE [US]); | GB2052994 [ ] (COHEN J J); | US4255790 [ ] (HONDEGHEM LUC M); | WO8403219 [ ] (KLOTZ ANTOINE); | US3782389 [ ] (BELL D); | US3096768 [ ] (GRIFFITH JR BENJAMIN WHITFIELD) |