EP0195054 - PESTICIDAL TRICYCLOALKYL-(2-PYRIDYLTHIO) TIN N-OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY 555 Market Street, P.O. Box 7141 San Francisco California 94120-7141 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY 555 Market Street, P.O. Box 7141 San Francisco, California 94120-7141 / US | ||
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY P.O. Box 7141 San Francisco, CA 94120-7141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, William, F. 1205 Lynwood Drive Novato, CA 94947 / US | [1986/39] | Application number, filing date | 85904775.5 | 26.09.1985 | [1986/39] | WO1985US01870 | Priority number, date | US19840655485 | 27.09.1984 Original published format: US 655485 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602075 | Date: | 10.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195054 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/22, A01N55/04 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
A01N55/04 (EP);
C07F7/226 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | TRIZYKLOALKYL-(2-PYRIDYLTHIO)-ZINN-N-OXIDE ALS PESTIZIDE | [1986/39] | English: | PESTICIDAL TRICYCLOALKYL-(2-PYRIDYLTHIO) TIN N-OXIDES | [1986/39] | French: | PESTICIDES A BASE DE N-OXYDES D'ETAIN TRICYCLOALKYL-(2-PYRIDYLTHIO) | [1986/39] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 28.08.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/14] | 14.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1987/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 27.06.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.10.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3027371 [ ]; | US3833565 [ ]; | US3824307 [ ]; | US4275199 [ ]; | US3321480 [ ]; | US2809971 [ ]; | JP3921362 [ ]; | CA979900 [ ]; | CA501851 [ ]; | US3832370 [ ]; | US4009168 [ ] |