EP0195088 - APPARATUS FOR SORTING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAKUBO, Hiroyasu 17-4, Nishiogikita 2-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo 167 / JP | 02 /
MIYAKE, Shinichi Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | 03 /
NISHIWAKI, Yoshikazu Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85904852.2 | 18.09.1985 | [1986/39] | WO1985JP00519 | Priority number, date | JP19840195932 | 18.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19593284 | JP19840195933 | 18.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19593384 | JP19840195934 | 18.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19593484 | JP19840195935 | 18.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19593584 | [1986/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601824 | Date: | 27.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195088 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195088 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M1/34, G01N33/577, G01N33/48, G01N35/02 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
G01N35/028 (EP,US);
C12M23/04 (EP,US);
C12M23/50 (EP,US);
C12M33/04 (EP,US);
C12M41/36 (EP,US);
C12M41/46 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRENNEN VON ZELLEN | [1986/39] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SORTING CELLS | [1986/39] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRIAGE DE CELLULES | [1986/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1986 | Translation filed | 16.05.1986 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1986 | Search fee paid | 16.05.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2357881 (DEV AUTOMAT BIOLOG [FR]); | [E]EP0171140 (UNIV TOKYO [JP]); | [E]EP0193385 (SHERWOOD MEDICAL CO [US]) | International search | [A]JPS58501521 ; | [A]JPS5978681 (KAWAHARA HARUYUKI) | Examination | US4106911 | - Methods of enzymology, vol. 70 "Immunological techniques", 1980, par.A. pp.392-393 |