EP0228376 - SPACE FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLASFAB PTY. LTD. 12 Gould road Herston, QLD 4006 / AU | [1987/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MacKENZIE, Noel, Gordon 35 Aberleigh Road Herston, QLD. 4006 / AU | [1987/29] | Application number, filing date | 85905187.2 | 08.10.1985 | [1987/29] | WO1985AU00244 | Priority number, date | AU19840007588 | 11.10.1984 Original published format: AU 758884 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602397 | Date: | 24.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0228376 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/19 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
E04B1/1903 (EP);
E04B2001/193 (EP);
E04B2001/1963 (EP);
E04B2001/1975 (EP);
E04B2001/1984 (EP);
E04B2001/199 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/29] | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALES GERÜST | [1987/29] | English: | SPACE FRAME | [1987/29] | French: | CHARPENTE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [1987/29] | File destroyed: | 18.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 14.05.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/27] | 06.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.05.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 13.05.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.04.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]AU3620978 ; | [Y]EP0034078 ; | [A]AU7282181 ; | [A]US4211044 ; | [A]US3914063 ; | [A]US3466824 ; | [A]AU3218584 |