EP0203098 - CONNECTOR APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1991 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1986/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARZYGNAT, William, Joseph 336 Watson Avenue Perth Amboy, NJ 08861 / US | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | ||
Former [1986/49] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 85905374.6 | 23.10.1985 | [1986/49] | WO1985US02093 | Priority number, date | US19840664701 | 25.10.1984 Original published format: US 664701 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602740 | Date: | 09.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203098 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203098 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
G02B6/3897 (EP,US);
G02B6/38 (KR);
G02B6/3839 (EP,US);
G02B6/3869 (EP,US);
G02B6/3873 (EP,US);
G02B6/3885 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1986/49] | English: | CONNECTOR APPARATUS | [1986/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF CONNECTEUR | [1986/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1986 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 22.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3904269 [ ] (LEBDUSKA ROBERT L, et al); | US4127319 [ ] (FORNEY JR EDGAR W, et al); | EP0045271 [ ] (RADIALL SA [FR]); | EP0061243 [ ] (AMP INC [US]); | EP0095281 [ ] (AMP INC [US]); | EP0119013 [ ] (NEC CORP [JP]) |