EP0202337 - STEPPING MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIBA, Yasuhiro 7-24-1011, Noe 1-chome Jyotoh-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 536 / JP | 02 /
NAMBA, Masato 1607-5, Oaza Hoshida Katano-shi Osaka-fu 576 / JP | 03 /
KIKUCHI, Seiji 20-103, Atagoyama 20-ban Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo-ken 662 / JP | 04 /
SOEJIMA, Hidenobu 5-11-402, Inaba 1-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka-fu 578 / JP | [1986/48] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Kirschner & Grosse Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | Patentanwälte Kirschner & Grosse Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85905435.5 | 05.11.1985 | [1986/48] | WO1985JP00611 | Priority number, date | JP19840235536 | 08.11.1984 Original published format: JP 23553684 | [1986/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603071 | Date: | 22.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0202337 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0202337 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02K37/14 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
H02K5/225 (EP,US);
H02K21/14 (EP,US);
H02K3/525 (EP,US);
H02K37/14 (EP,US);
H02K5/1672 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/48] | Title | German: | STEPMOTOR | [1986/48] | English: | STEPPING MOTOR | [1986/48] | French: | MOTEUR PAS A PAS | [1986/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1986 | Translation filed | 02.07.1986 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1986 | Search fee paid | 02.07.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/04] | 12.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3479539 (BRION STANLEY A); | [X]FR2078644 (SAIA AG); | [X]FR2362517 (BUNKER RAMO [US]); | [A]DE3310289 (BERGER LAHR GMBH [DE]) | International search | [Y]JPS5925987U ; | [Y]JPS5963972 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS59119783U |