EP0245248 - COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH ALTERNATING ROTARY PISTONS AND TWO WORKING CHAMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1988 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.1988 [1988/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OROMCHIAN, Mirza Agha 11-13, rue Ferdinand-Fabre 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | For all designated states OROMCHIAN, Mirza Agha 11-13, rue Ferdinand-Fabre F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/47] | Application number, filing date | 85905832.3 | 20.11.1985 | [1987/47] | WO1985FR00325 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703331 | Date: | 04.06.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0245248 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F01C9/00 | [1987/47] | CPC: |
F02B53/02 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/47] | Title | German: | ROTIERENDE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT HIN UND HER GEHENDEN KOLBEN, MIT ZWEI ARBEITSKAMMERN | [1987/47] | English: | COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH ALTERNATING ROTARY PISTONS AND TWO WORKING CHAMBERS | [1987/47] | French: | MOTEUR A COMBUSTION A PISTONS ROTATIFS ALTERNATIFS A DEUX CHAMBRES DE TRAVAIL | [1987/47] | File destroyed: | 18.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/19] | 25.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.08.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 20.08.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 20.08.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 20.08.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 20.08.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 20.08.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 20.08.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 20.08.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 20.08.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 20.08.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.12.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1320215 [ ]; | FR930561 [ ]; | US3483578 [ ] (HARRISON THOMAS R); | US1917180 [ ] (WALTER ZWICK) |