EP0203132 - ACOUSTIC SIGNAL ATTENUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.1987 [1987/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARRACK, Andrew 6 Oak Path Bushey Herfordshire / GB | For all designated states LAMBE, John Charles Little Viners Church Lane Shilton Oxfordshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states WARRACK, Andrew 6 Oak Path Bushey Herfordshire / GB | ||
For all designated states LAMBE, John Charles Little Viners Church Lane Shilton Oxfordshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/49] | Application number, filing date | 85905859.6 | 21.11.1985 | [1986/49] | WO1985GB00536 | Priority number, date | GB19840029664 | 23.11.1984 Original published format: GB 8429664 | GB19850024934 | 09.10.1985 Original published format: GB 8524934 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603353 | Date: | 05.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203132 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/32, H04M1/57, G08B3/10 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
H03G3/34 (EP);
G08B3/10 (EP);
H03G3/32 (EP);
H04M1/82 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | ABSCHWÄCHER AKUSTISCHER SIGNALE | [1986/49] | English: | ACOUSTIC SIGNAL ATTENUATOR | [1986/49] | French: | ATTENUATEUR DE SIGNAUX ACOUSTIQUES | [1986/49] | File destroyed: | 29.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 26.09.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/23] | 16.12.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1987/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.08.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4425477 ; | [X]DE3046862 ; | [X]US4389543 ; | [Y]US4437018 ; | [X]JPS57104312 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 6, No. 194, 2 October 1982, page 1072E-134 & JP - A - 57 104 312 (SONY)29 June 1982 |