EP0210181 - DISPATCH TRUNKED RADIO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.08.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1995 | Opposition rejected | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1987/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZDUNEK, Kenneth, John 428 Linsey Schaumburg, IL 60194 / US | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Hudson, Peter David Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1987/06] | Hudson, Peter David Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 85905981.8 | 05.11.1985 | [1987/06] | WO1985US02208 | Priority number, date | US19840687810 | 31.12.1984 Original published format: US 687810 | [1987/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604199 | Date: | 17.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0210181 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210181 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.07.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/15 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
H04W84/08 (EP,US);
H04B7/15 (KR);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L1/0072 (EP,US);
H04W4/10 (EP,US);
H04W76/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | FUNKVERBINDUNGSSYSTEM MIT KANALVERTEILUNG | [1987/06] | English: | DISPATCH TRUNKED RADIO SYSTEM | [1987/06] | French: | SYSTEME RADIO A PARTAGE DE PLUSIEURS CANAUX D'EMISSION | [1987/06] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/39: Teilanmeldung 90117730.3 eingereicht am 05/11/85 | EPB 1991/39: Divisional application 90117730.3 filed on 05/11/85 | EPB 1991/39: Demande divisionnaire 90117730.3 déposée le 05/11/85 | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1986 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.1986 | Search fee paid | 01.09.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 02.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP90117730.3 / EP0411677 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1992
07.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Alcatel N.V. Strawinskylaan 341 NL-1077 XX AMSTERDAM / NL Opponent's representative Graf, Georg Hugo Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | 02
22.06.1992
10.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Nokia Cellular Systems Oy P.O. Box 44 SF-02601 Espoo / FI Opponent's representative Howden, Christopher A. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | 03
25.06.1992
07.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1992
07.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Alcatel N.V. Strawinskylaan 341 NL-1077 XX AMSTERDAM / NL Opponent's representative Graf, Georg Hugo, Dipl.-Ing. Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
22.06.1992
10.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Nokia Cellular Systems Oy P.O. Box 44 SF-02601 Espoo / FI Opponent's representative Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | |||
03
25.06.1992
07.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | |||
Former [1992/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1992
07.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Alcatel N.V. Strawinskylaan 341 NL-1077 XX AMSTERDAM / NL Opponent's representative Graf, Georg Hugo, Dipl.-Ing. Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
22.06.1992
10.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Nokia Cellular Systems Oy P.O. Box 44 SF-02601 Espoo / FI Opponent's representative Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | 03.08.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.05.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.05.1995 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.1991 | [1992/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 24, No. 11B, April 1982, pages 5805-5808; New York, US, D.F. BANTZ: "Continuation packet protocol", whole article. | International search | [A]US4012597 (LYNK JR CHARLES NELSON, et al); | [Y]US4027243 (STACKHOUSE BILL L, et al); | [A]US4156867 (BENCH STEPHEN M [US], et al); | [X]US4312070 (COOMBES DANIEL J, et al); | [A]US4360927 (BOWEN WILLIAM A, et al); | [YP]US4553262 (COE RICHARD H [US]) |