EP0203146 - TRENCH TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1986/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANCASTER, Loren, Thomas 1717 Shenandoah Court Allentown, PA 18104 / US | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | ||
Former [1986/49] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 85905997.4 | 13.11.1985 | [1986/49] | WO1985US02244 | Priority number, date | US19840675305 | 27.11.1984 Original published format: US 675305 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603341 | Date: | 05.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203146 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203146 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L21/28, H01L21/82 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
H01L29/0847 (EP,US);
H01L29/78 (EP,KR);
H01L29/66621 (EP);
H01L29/66787 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/49] | Title | German: | TRANSISTOR MIT TIEFEM GRABEN | [1986/49] | English: | TRENCH TRANSISTOR | [1986/49] | French: | TRANSISTOR A TRANCHEE | [1986/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1986 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 31.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0094891 [ ] (FAIRCHILD CAMERA INSTR CO [US]); | EP0066081 [ ] (IBM [US]); | US4296429 [ ] (SCHROEDER JAMES E); | US4419811 [ ] (RICE EDWARD J [US]) |