EP0189769 - Rotary or percussion drill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kress, Willy Breitenwasen 1 D-7457 Bisingen / DE | [1986/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/32] | Representative(s) | Otte, Peter Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte, Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | Otte, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Mollenbachstrasse 37 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100313.5 | 11.01.1986 | [1986/32] | Priority number, date | DE19853503172 | 31.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3503172 | [1986/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0189769 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189769 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B25D16/00 | [1986/32] | CPC: |
B25D16/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/32] | Title | German: | Bohr- oder Schlaghammer | [1986/32] | English: | Rotary or percussion drill | [1986/32] | French: | Perforateur rotatif ou à percussion | [1986/32] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/15] | 03.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3018633 (WACKER WERKE KG [DE]); | [Y]US2966974 (PASKOWSKI WALTER B, et al); | [A]DE3213672 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2396155 (HILTI AG [LI]); | [A]FR2218972 (SKIL NEDERLAND NV [NL]); | [A]DE3311263 (HILTI AG [LI]); | [A]GB2136722 (HILTI AG) |