EP0192039 - Cutter for a meat-cutting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGURIT Gefrierschneider GmbH Höhenweg 91 D-5630 Remscheid-Lennep / DE | [1986/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hager, Jürgen, Dr. Oberdorp 196 D-5609 Hückeswagen / DE | 02 /
Vieth, Walter Arnzhäuschen 19 D-5632 Wermelskirchen 2 / DE | [1986/35] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1986/35] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100459.6 | 15.01.1986 | [1986/35] | Priority number, date | DE19850005062U | 22.02.1985 Original published format: DE 8505062 U | [1986/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0192039 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0192039 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0192039 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/00, // B26D1/09 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
B26D3/20 (EP);
B26D1/09 (EP);
B26D7/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/35] | Title | German: | Messerkopf für eine Fleischschneidemaschine | [1986/35] | English: | Cutter for a meat-cutting machine | [1986/35] | French: | Couteau pour une machine à découper de la viande | [1986/35] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 18.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE91100 ; | [Y]CH155718 (AESCHBACH F AG [CH]); | [Y]CH348791 (DONDAINAZ GEORGES [CH], et al); | [A]BE647304 ; | [A]DE1264237 (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO); | [AD]DE2605234 (MAGURIT GUSTAV RITTERSHAUS FA) |