Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] |
09.05.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] |
19.12.1989 | First examination report | |
22.12.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.02.1988 [1988/06] |
22.12.1987 | Change - representative | published on 10.02.1988 [1988/06] |
07.12.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 27.01.1988 [1988/04] |
02.08.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.09.1986 [1986/38] |