EP0194414 - DC-DC converter with a plurality of regulated outputs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH Gerberstrasse 33 D-71522 Backnang / DE | [1986/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grünsch, Eckhardt Ernst-Wecker-Strasse 10 D-7173 Mainhardt / DE | [1986/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1988/06] |
Former [1986/38] | Schickle, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gerberstrasse 33 D-7150 Backnang / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100530.4 | 17.01.1986 | [1986/38] | Priority number, date | DE19853508895 | 13.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3508895 | [1986/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0194414 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0194414 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194414 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
H02M3/28 (EP);
H02M3/33561 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/38] | Title | German: | Gleichspannungswandler mit mehreren geregelten Ausgängen | [1986/38] | English: | DC-DC converter with a plurality of regulated outputs | [1986/38] | French: | Convertisseur courant continu-courant continu à plusieurs sorties régulées | [1986/38] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/06] | 21.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4323961 (JOSEPHSON ELLIOT); | [A]FR2354659 (ROVSING AS CHRISTIAN [DK]) |