EP0189129 - Process for the addition of hydrogen and organic radicals to olefinically and acetylenically unsaturated compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menig, Helmuth, Dr. Hauptstrasse 22 D-6701 Friedelsheim / DE | 02 /
Halbritter, Klaus, Dr. Schwarzwaldstrasse 19 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | [1986/31] | Application number, filing date | 86100541.1 | 17.01.1986 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | DE19853502079 | 23.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3502079 | [1986/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189129 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189129 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/34, C07C31/125, C07D307/20, C07C33/025, C07C69/612, C07C69/708, C07C69/80, C07D307/32, C07D307/60 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
C07D307/33 (EP);
C07C29/44 (EP);
C07C51/567 (EP);
C07D307/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/44, C07C31/125 (EP);
C07C29/44, C07C33/025 (EP) |
Former IPC [1986/31] | C07C69/34, C07C31/125, C07D307/20, C07C33/025, C07C69/612, C07C69/708 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Addition von Wasserstoff und organischen Resten an olefinisch und acetylenisch ungesättigte Verbindungen | [1986/31] | English: | Process for the addition of hydrogen and organic radicals to olefinically and acetylenically unsaturated compounds | [1986/31] | French: | Procédé d'addition d'hydrogène et de radicaux organiques à composés non-saturés oléfiniquement et acétyléniquement | [1986/31] | File destroyed: | 29.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 12.09.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2552980 ; | [AP]EP0133739 | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Band 17, 1952, Seitenf 1009-1016, Columbus, OhioUS; T.M. PATRICK "The free readical addition of aldehydes to unsaturated polycarboxylic esters" | [AD] - ORGANIC REACTIONS, Band 13, Seite 108, London, GB; John Wiley & SonsInc. |