EP0193716 - Adsorptive separation of methane and carbon dioxide gas mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. P.O. Box 538 Allentown, Pennsylvania 18105 / US | [1986/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sircar, Shivaji 1508 Bogie Avenue Wescosville PA 18106 / US | 02 /
Koch, William Rohrer RD 1 Box 1216 Fleetwood PA / US | [1986/37] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/37] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86100606.2 | 17.01.1986 | [1986/37] | Priority number, date | US19850695151 | 25.01.1985 Original published format: US 695151 | [1986/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193716 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193716 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, C01B31/20, C07C9/04 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
B01D53/0476 (EP);
C01B3/56 (EP);
C01B32/50 (EP);
C07C7/13 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2253/108 (EP);
B01D2253/25 (EP);
B01D2256/16 (EP);
B01D2256/22 (EP);
B01D2256/245 (EP);
B01D2257/504 (EP);
B01D2259/4003 (EP);
B01D2259/40032 (EP);
B01D2259/40064 (EP);
B01D2259/40066 (EP);
B01D2259/404 (EP);
B01D2259/4061 (EP);
B01D2259/4062 (EP);
C01B2203/043 (EP);
C01B2203/0475 (EP);
Y02C20/40 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C7/13, C07C9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/37] | Title | German: | Adsorptive Trennung von Gasmischungen aus Methan und Kohlendioxid | [1986/37] | English: | Adsorptive separation of methane and carbon dioxide gas mixtures | [1986/37] | French: | Séparation adsorptive de mélanges de gaz de méthane et de dioxyde de carbone | [1986/37] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 17.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/17] | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0008512 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [X]EP0008882 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [X]EP0103070 (BERGWERKSVERBAND GMBH [DE]); | [YD]US4077779 (SIRCAR SHIVAJI, et al); | [YD]US3751878 (COLLINS J) |