Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] |
24.03.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.05.1990 [1990/19] |
24.07.1989 | Change - applicant | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] |
24.07.1989 | Change - representative | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] |
06.09.1988 | First examination report | |
10.03.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 29.04.1987 [1987/18] |
27.06.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.08.1986 [1986/33] |
27.06.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.08.1986 [1986/33] |