EP0191371 - Cabinet for the orderly storage of mounting sheets for making printing plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kieper, Horst Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 15 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1986/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Spalthoff, Adolf Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 D-45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101198.9 | 30.01.1986 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | DE19853504081 | 07.02.1985 Original published format: DE 3504081 | [1986/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191371 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191371 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191371 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B42F15/00, B42F15/06 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
G03F1/90 (EP);
B42F15/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/34] | B42F15/00 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1986/34] | Title | German: | Schrank zum geordneten Aufbewahren von Montagefolien zur Herstellung von Druckplatten | [1986/34] | English: | Cabinet for the orderly storage of mounting sheets for making printing plates | [1986/34] | French: | Armoire de dépôt arrangé pour feuilles de montage prévues pour la fabrication de plaques d'impression | [1986/34] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 17.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0004827 ; | [A]DE2450284 ; | [A]DE869680 |