EP0192104 - Oscillating circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/35] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aizawa, Iwao 59-16, Torigaoka Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1986/35] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/35] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101285.4 | 31.01.1986 | [1986/35] | Priority number, date | JP19850030330 | 20.02.1985 Original published format: JP 3033085 | [1986/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0192104 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0192104 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0192104 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/08 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
H03L7/085 (EP,US);
H03K3/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/16] |
Former [1986/35] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Oszillatorschaltung | [1986/35] | English: | Oscillating circuit | [1986/35] | French: | Circuit oscillateur | [1986/35] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 31.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 18.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP6076813 ; | [A]GB1481786 (FARNELL INSTR LTD, et al); | [A]US4196445 (KUNIYOSHI YASUNOBU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0054322 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al); | [A]GB2091961 (SANGAMO WESTON); | [A]US4426627 (YOSHISATO AKIYUKI [JP], et al) |