EP0190696 - Suspension controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/33] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asami, Ken c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohashi, Kaoru c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Onuma, Toshio c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Buma, Shuuichi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1986/33] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2009/48] |
Former [1986/33] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101360.5 | 03.02.1986 | [1986/33] | Priority number, date | JP19850020671 | 04.02.1985 Original published format: JP 2067185 | JP19850020672 | 04.02.1985 Original published format: JP 2067285 | [1986/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0190696 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0190696 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/04 | [1986/33] | CPC: |
B60G17/033 (EP,US);
B60G17/016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/33] | Title | German: | Regelsystem für eine Radaufhängung | [1986/33] | English: | Suspension controller | [1986/33] | French: | Système de régulation d'une suspension | [1986/33] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 29.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59023712 ; | [A]FR2225303 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]US2978254 (BUNDORF RONALD T) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 116 (M-299)[1553], 30th May 1984; & JP-A-59 023 712 (HINO JIDOSHA) 07-02-1984 (Cat. D,A), & JP59023712 A 00000000 |