Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3661874D1 | 23.02.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3505578 | 18.02.1985 | DE3661874 | 05.02.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0195214 | Global Dossier | 18.01.1989 | B1 | EP0195214 | 05.11.1986 | A3 | EP0195214 | 24.09.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3505578 | 18.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3505578 | 21.08.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3505578 | 18.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS61189499 | 23.08.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3505578 | 18.02.1985 |