EP0195214 - Method for the multistage treatment of radioactive waste water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states KRAFTWERK UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wiesenstrasse 35 D-4330 Mülheim (Ruhr) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Queiser, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Ahornweg 18 D-6454 Bruchköbel / DE | 02 /
Meichsner, Othmar, Dipl.-Ing. Ringstrasse 98 D-6096 Raunheim / DE | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1987/39] |
Former [1986/39] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101451.2 | 05.02.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | DE19853505578 | 18.02.1985 Original published format: DE 3505578 | [1986/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0195214 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0195214 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195214 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/06 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
B01D61/025 (EP);
B01D61/145 (EP);
G21F9/06 (EP);
B01D2311/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/02, B01D2311/2646 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1986/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur mehrstufigen Aufbereitung radioaktiver Abwässer | [1986/39] | English: | Method for the multistage treatment of radioactive waste water | [1986/39] | French: | Procédé de traitement à étages multiples pour les eaux résiduaires radioactives | [1986/39] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 13.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2520850 [ ]; | DE3003181 [ ] (SCHULZ WERNER [DE]); | US4442028 [ ] (WOLF GARY A [US], et al); | DE2554891 [ ] (US ENERGY) |