Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0193007 | Global Dossier | 27.04.1988 | A3 | EP0193007 | 03.09.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3506687 | 26.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1005410B | 11.10.1989 | B | CN86100366 | 20.08.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3506687 | 26.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3506687 | 28.08.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3506687 | 26.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8704858 | 16.04.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3506687 | 26.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4705634 | 10.11.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3506687 | 26.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA861402 | 29.10.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3506687 | 26.02.1985 |