EP0193007 - Process and apparatus for the biological purification of waste water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reimann, Hans, Dr.rer.nat. Rudolf-Wilke-Weg 21 D-8000 München 71 / DE | 02 /
Wildmoser, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Flurstrasse 12 D-8013 Haar / DE | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101535.2 | 06.02.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | DE19853506687 | 26.02.1985 Original published format: DE 3506687 | [1986/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193007 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193007 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
C02F3/087 (EP,US);
C02F1/006 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur biologischen Reinigung von Abwasser | [1986/36] | English: | Process and apparatus for the biological purification of waste water | [1986/36] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la purification biologique d'eau usée | [1986/36] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/35] | 24.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/01] | 22.07.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2936826 (GEIGER MASCHF HELMUT [DE]); | [A]DE2035427 ; | [A]EP0112095 (WATER RES CENTRE [GB]); | [A]DE3024997 (EMDE WILHELM VON DER PROF DR I) |