EP0191432 - Method and apparatus for effecting light energy transmission with lessened reflection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1992 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [1986/34] | For all designated states DORRAN PHOTONICS INCORPORATED 81 First Avenue Atlantic Highlands New Jersey 07716 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cook, John S. 1 Markwood Lane Rumson New Jersey 07760 / US | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/35] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/34] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101603.8 | 07.02.1986 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | US19850700458 | 11.02.1985 Original published format: US 700458 | [1986/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191432 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191432 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191432 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/26 | [1986/34] | CPC: |
G02B6/3822 (EP,US);
G02B6/24 (KR);
G02B6/262 (EP,US);
G02B6/264 (EP,US);
G02B6/3855 (EP,US);
G02B6/4207 (EP,US);
G02B6/3874 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ausführung von Lichtenergie-Übertragung mit verminderter Reflexion | [1986/34] | English: | Method and apparatus for effecting light energy transmission with lessened reflection | [1986/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour effectuer la transmission de l'énergie lumineuse avec une réflexion diminuée | [1986/34] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 09.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP52009449 ; | [A]JP59134885 ; | [A]JP59057209 ; | [A]JP59044013 ; | [X]EP0088410 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]AU521528B (AUSTRALIAN TELECOMM) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no 72 (E-77), 13th July 1977, page 779 E 77; & JP-A-52 009 449 (FUJITSU K.K.) 25-01-1977, & JP52009449 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 264 (E-282)[1701], 4th December 1984; & JP-A-59 134 885 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 02-08-1984, & JP59134885 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 159 (P-289)[1596], 24th July 1984; & JP-A-59 057 209 (FUJITSU K.K.) 02-04-1984, & JP59057209 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 144 (P-284)[1581], 5th July 1984; & JP-A-59 044 013 (NIHON MUSEN K.K.) 12-03-1984, & JP59044013 A 00000000 | Examination | JPS529449 |