EP0191483 - Method and apparatus for biological aerobic wastewater treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.1991 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Loveless, Inc. 14040 Sante Fe Trail Drive Lenexa Kansas 66215 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | For all designated states Smith & Loveless, Inc. 14040 Sante Fe Trail Drive Lenexa Kansas 66215 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weis, Frank G. 438 North Van Brunt Kansas City Missouri 64123 / US | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/34] | Strehl, -Schübel-Hopf, -Groening, -Schulz Widenmayerstrasse 17 Postfach 22 03 45 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101794.5 | 12.02.1986 | [1986/34] | Priority number, date | US19850700757 | 12.02.1985 Original published format: US 700757 | [1986/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0191483 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0191483 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F3/18, B01D21/02, B01D21/30 | [1986/34] | CPC: |
C02F3/18 (EP,KR,US);
B01D21/0003 (EP,US);
B01D21/0024 (EP,US);
B01D21/0042 (EP,US);
B01D21/0087 (EP,US);
B01D21/16 (EP,US);
B01D21/2405 (EP,US);
B01D21/2433 (EP,US);
B01D21/34 (EP,US);
C02F1/006 (EP,US);
C02F3/1257 (EP,US);
B01D2221/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D21/30, B01D21/16, B01D21/2405, B01D21/0024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die aerobe biologische Abwasserbehandlung | [1986/34] | English: | Method and apparatus for biological aerobic wastewater treatment | [1986/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement biologique aérobie d'eau usée | [1986/34] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 13.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/10] | 13.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4457844 (BEARD HAROLD J [US]); | [AD]US4487692 (KERSTEN WILLIAM W [US]); | [A]US3900394 (RONGVED PAUL I); | [A]GB531606 (STANLEY RONALD LITTLE, et al); | [A]US3298529 (LONGNECKER HAROLD D); | [A]DE3007035 (PFEIFFER HELMUT [DE]) | [Y] - LEHR- UND HANDBUCH DER ABWASSERTECHNIK, 3rd edition, vol. IV, 1985, pages 332-334, Ernst & Sohn, Berlin, DE | [Y] - WASTEWATER TREATMENT PLANT DESIGN, 1977, pages 140-144,150, Water Pollution Control Federation, Washington, D.C., US |