EP0193052 - Azoacylacetamide dispersing agents and azo-pigment compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | [1987/37] |
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOECHST CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castenson, Richard, Dr. 9 Peach Tree Lane Coventry Rhode Island 02816 / US | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 61-63 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr., et al Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 86101936.2 | 15.02.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | US19850704822 | 25.02.1985 Original published format: US 704822 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0193052 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193052 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C107/04, C09B35/10, B01F17/00 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
C09D11/037 (EP,US);
C09B35/105 (EP,US);
C09B67/0055 (EP,US);
C09B69/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/36] | Title | German: | Azoacylacetamid-Dispergiermittel und Azopigmentzusammensetzungen | [1986/36] | English: | Azoacylacetamide dispersing agents and azo-pigment compositions | [1986/36] | French: | Agents de dispersion du type azoacylacétamide et compositions de pigment azoique | [1986/36] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/48] | 04.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2214730 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |