EP0199924 - Gutter-supporting ceiling elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gutermuth, Paul, sen. Augustastrasse 48 D-63505 Langenselbold / DE | [1986/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1986/45] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Strasse & Stoffregen Salzstrasse 11a Postfach 2144 D-63411 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102403.2 | 25.02.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | DE19853507306 | 01.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3507306 | [1986/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199924 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199924 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199924 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/34 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
E04B9/023 (EP);
E04B9/363 (EP);
F24C15/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/45] | E04B5/62, E04B5/52, F24C15/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/45] | Title | German: | Rinne zur Aufnahme von Deckenelementen | [1986/45] | English: | Gutter-supporting ceiling elements | [1986/45] | French: | Gouttière de support pour éléments de plafond | [1986/45] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 09.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3088392 (EGAN CHARLES E); | [A]FR1414323 (ZIMMER VERFAHRENSTECHNIK); | [AD]EP0059768 (GUTERMUTH PAUL [DE], et al) |