EP0199017 - Tension levelling strip material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.1988 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Steel Corporation 9 Albert Embankment London SE1 7SN / GB | [1986/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fletcher, Leslie Alfred Morpeth House Magor Road Langstone Newport Gwent NP6 2JX / GB | 02 /
Sherriff, John Cooper 27 Woodlane Hawarden Deeside Clwyd CH5 3JD / GB | 03 /
Wynne, Douglas Clifford Glasfryn Pen Y Cefn Nr. Caerwys Mold Clwyd / GB | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Broughton, Clifford David British Steel plc Patent Section 9 Albert Embankment London SE1 7SN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | Broughton, Clifford David British Steel plc Patent Section 9 Albert Embankment London SE1 7SN / GB | Application number, filing date | 86102412.3 | 25.02.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | GB19850006119 | 08.03.1985 Original published format: GB 8506119 | [1986/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199017 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199017 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B21D1/05 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
B21D1/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/44] | Title | German: | Ausgleich der Spannung bei Bandmaterial | [1986/44] | English: | Tension levelling strip material | [1986/44] | French: | Egalisation de tension dans les feuillards métalliques | [1986/44] | File destroyed: | 19.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/22] | 07.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.10.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS55153622 ; | [Y]JPS55122629 ; | [A]JPS5886933 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 25 (M-55)[697]14th February 1981; & JP - A - 55 153 622 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 29-11-1980 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 171 (M-44)[653]26th November 1980; & JP - A - 55 122 629 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 20-09-1980 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 187 (M-236)[1332]16th August 1983; & JP - A - 58 86933 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 24-05-1983 |