EP0199019 - Ballistic-resistant fabric article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1986/44] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harpell, Gary Allan c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 02 /
Palley, Igor c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 03 /
Kavesh, Sheldon c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 04 /
Prevorsek, Dusan Ciril c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Langner Parry, 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | ||
Former [1995/50] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | ||
Former [1992/01] | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/44] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102454.5 | 25.02.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | US19850704848 | 25.02.1985 Original published format: US 704848 | US19850825114 | 09.12.1985 Original published format: US 825114 | [1986/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199019 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199019 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199019 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F41H1/02 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
F41H5/0485 (EP,US);
Y10S428/911 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31826 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2623 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/44] | Title | German: | Beschussfestes Gewebe | [1986/44] | English: | Ballistic-resistant fabric article | [1986/44] | French: | Tissu pare-balles | [1986/44] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
26.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE ACORDIS AG Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
26.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE ACORDIS AG Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
26.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE ACORDIS AG Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
26.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Faser AG Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
26.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Faser AG Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 D-42103 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1993/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
Akzo Faser AG Fachbereich Patentwesen Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | 15.06.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.12.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.01.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.11.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/20] | 17.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 30.03.1995 | Appeal received No. T0279/95 | 03.06.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.11.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 17.11.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.1999 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 24.09.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0089537 [ ] (ALLIED CORP [US]); | US4535027 [ ] (KOBASHI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) | [ ] - ROY C. LAIBLE "Ballistic Materials and Penetration Mechanics" 1980 ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY, Amsterdam-Oxford-New York * Page 108, line 19 - page 109, line 4 * |