EP0195281 - Circuit arrangement for picture processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Gerätetechnik GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Gerätetechnik GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 Postfach 1120 D-88662 Überlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uihlein, Christoph, Dr. Strandweg 39 D-7770 Überlingen / DE | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Weisse, Jürgen, et al Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtraustrasse 38 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Weisse, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, et al Fuggerstrasse 26 D-10777 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102506.2 | 26.02.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | DE19853509508 | 16.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3509508 | [1986/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0195281 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0195281 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195281 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/46 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/136 (EP);
G06T7/187 (EP);
G06V10/457 (EP,US);
G06T2200/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung für die Bildverarbeitung | [1986/39] | English: | Circuit arrangement for picture processing | [1986/39] | French: | Circuit de traitement d'images | [1986/39] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 25.09.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1311671 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]US4183013 (AGRAWALA ASHOK K [US], et al) |