EP0195288 - Gymnastics device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMC CORPORATION Ruessenstrasse 16 Walterswil CH-6340 Baar/Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states TMC CORPORATION Ruessenstrasse 16 Walterswil CH-6340 Baar/Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neckamm, Harald Syringerstrasse 17/2/14 A-1210 Wien / AT | 02 /
Pavlovec, Radko Johann Straussgasse 24/28 A-1040 Wien / AT | 03 /
Zotter, Johann Kaiserstrasse 105 A-1070 Wien / AT | 04 /
Würthner, Hubert Neugasse 3 A-2410 Hainburg/Donau / AT | 05 /
Dyne, Andreas Karlsgustavsgatan 39 S-41131 Göteborg / SE | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Szász, Tibor Josef HTM Sport- u. Freizeitgeräte AG Tyroliaplatz 1 A-2320 Schwechat / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Szász, Tibor, Dipl.-Ing. HTM Sport- u. Freizeitgeräte AG Tyroliaplatz 1 A-2320 Schwechat / AT | Application number, filing date | 86102606.0 | 28.02.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | AT19850000796 | 18.03.1985 Original published format: AT 79685 | AT19850001409 | 10.05.1985 Original published format: AT 140985 | [1986/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0195288 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0195288 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195288 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/00, A63B23/00 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
A63B21/05 (EP,US);
Y10S482/908 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/39] | A63B21/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1986/39] | Title | German: | Gymnastikgerät | [1986/39] | English: | Gymnastics device | [1986/39] | French: | Appareil de gymnastique | [1986/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 19.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2410473 [ ] (MILLANVOYE GEORGES [FR]); | FR2140739 [ ] (GROCQ EDMOND); | FR2049255 [ ] (BEAU GEORGES); | WO8403834 [ ] (MATHEISEN HANS WERNER); | DE2822850 [ ] (ORTOPEDIA GMBH); | US2554653 [ ] (GEORGE WISECARVER); | GB196117 [ ] (HARRY RIVETT); | AT377182B [ ] (VON OTHEGRAVEN ACHIM [AT]); | DE3223626 [ ] (OTHEGRAVEN ACHIM VON); | EP0058848 [ ] (WEBER HENNING HANS) |