EP0195310 - Ventilating needle and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading as TERUMO CORPORATION 44-1, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-Ku Tokyo 151 / JP | [1986/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Isao 472 Tamagawa Ryuo-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi-ken / JP | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86102851.2 | 05.03.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | JP19850047776 | 11.03.1985 Original published format: JP 4777685 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195310 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195310 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/16 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
A61M25/0014 (EP,US);
A61M5/162 (EP,US);
B29C37/0085 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/1222 (EP,US);
B29C66/1224 (EP,US);
B29C66/30223 (EP,US);
B29C66/30325 (EP,US);
B29C66/3034 (EP,US);
B29C66/5344 (EP,US);
B29C66/5346 (EP,US);
B29C66/612 (EP,US);
B29C66/723 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/73175 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1623 (EP,US);
B29C65/7847 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C69/005 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/04 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/10 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/16 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1986/39] | Title | German: | Entlüftungsnadel und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1986/39] | English: | Ventilating needle and method of manufacturing the same | [1986/39] | French: | Aiguille d'entrée d'air et méthode de fabrication | [1986/39] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 02.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 10.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0045605 (CLARKE JACQUELINE MARGARET [GB]); | [Y]FR1600598 ; | [Y]US4326957 (ROSENBERG DAVID J); | [A]US4055176 (LUNDQUIST INGEMAR H); | [A]GB2103590 (SMITH & NEPHEW ASS [GB]); | [A]FR2100431 (ABBOTT LAB) |