EP0200875 - Process and apparatus for waste water purification by the activated-sludge process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | [1986/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soeder, Carl Johannes, Prof. Diemelstrasse 5 D-4600 Dortmund 41 / DE | 02 /
Keusen, Heinrich Artilleriestrasse 30 D-5170 Jülich / DE | 03 /
Zanders, Erich Kerpener Strasse 9 D-5013 Elsdorf / DE | 04 /
Hofmeister, Franz Auf der Hüchte 25 D-4440 Rheine 11 / DE | [1986/46] | Application number, filing date | 86102914.8 | 05.03.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | DE19853508126 | 07.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3508126 | [1986/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200875 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200875 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200875 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, G01N27/00 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
C02F3/1263 (EP,US);
C02F3/006 (EP,US);
C02F3/12 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US);
Y10S210/903 (EP,US);
Y10S210/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abwasserreinigung nach dem Belebtschlammverfahren | [1986/46] | English: | Process and apparatus for waste water purification by the activated-sludge process | [1986/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la purification d'eau usée suivant la méthode de boues activées | [1986/46] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/49: (deleted) | EPB 1986/46: Ein Antrag nach Regel 88 EPÜ auf Berichtigung der Fifur 4 liegt vor. Hierüber wir von der Prüfungsabteilung entschiedung werden (Richtlinien für die Prüfung im EPA, A V 2.2) | Examination procedure | 24.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 20.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1584923 (KOPPERS GMBH HEINRICH); | [Y]DE2909333 (LINDE AG) | [YD] - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, Band 15, 1982, Seiten 246-251, Springer-Verlag, DE: E. VAN DEN EYNDE et al.: "Relation between substrate feeding pattern and development of filamentous bacteria in activated sludge processes" |