EP0198207 - Specific iodination of nucleic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 400 Morgan Lane West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [1986/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dattagupta, Nanibhushan 470 Prospect Street New Haven, Ct 06511 / US | 02 /
Knowles, William, Dr. 101 Sleeping Giant Drive Hamden Connecticut / US | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Adrian, Albert, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Adrian, Albert, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Lizenzen und Technische Kooperationen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103106.0 | 08.03.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | US19850714306 | 21.03.1985 Original published format: US 714306 | [1986/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198207 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198207 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/00 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6816 (EP);
G01N33/534 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | Spezifische Jodierung von Nukleinsäure | [1986/43] | English: | Specific iodination of nucleic acid | [1986/43] | French: | Ioduration spécifique d'acide nucléique | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 25.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4310675 (AKERKAR ANANDRAO S, et al); | [Y]US4397779 (GROMAN ERNEST V, et al); | [Y]WO8403285 (MOLECULAR BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]); | [Y]EP0097373 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 17, 24th April 1978, page 215, abstract no. 117161m, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.M. TENER et al.: "Synthesis of iodine-125-labeled N-3-(4-hydroxyphenyl)propionyl aminoacyl transfer ribonucleic acids", BIOCHEMISTRY 1978, 17(4), 741-5 |