EP0236528 - Cover cap for a multicontact electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.A. Weidmüller GmbH & Co. Postfach 950 Paderborner Strasse 175 D-32760 Detmold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states C.A. Weidmüller GmbH & Co. Postfach 950 Paderborner Strasse 175 D-32760 Detmold / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dürkop, Willi Geierweg 7 D-4930 Detmold / DE | 02 /
Schmode, Hartmut Zehlendorfer Strasse 5 D-4933 Blomberg / DE | 03 /
Strate, Klaus Augustdorfer Strasse 43 D-4930 Detmold / DE | 04 /
Hanning, Walter Am Hang 4 D-4901 Hiddenhausen / DE | 05 /
Steinkuhle, Ferdinand Wiesenweg 8 D-4790 Paderborn / DE | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Loesenbeck, Karl-Otto, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Loesenbeck, Karl-Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103330.6 | 12.03.1986 | [1987/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0236528 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236528 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/50, H02G3/04 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
H01R13/501 (EP,US);
H02G3/0437 (EP,US);
H01R13/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/38] | Title | German: | Abdeckhaube für mehrpolige elektrische Verbinder | [1987/38] | English: | Cover cap for a multicontact electrical connector | [1987/38] | French: | Capot de contact pour connecteur électrique à contacts multiples | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/48] | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2335076 (ELEKTROTECHNISCHEN BEDARF FAB [DE]); | [A]DE2934953 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4335271 (HASLBECK JOSEPH) |