EP0204898 - Contactless test method and measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/51] | Contactless test method | ||
[1989/33] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1991 | Opposition rejected | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobler, Klaus, Dr.-Ing. Bettäckerstrasse 12 D-7016 Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
Hachtel, Hansjörg, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Buchenstrasse 4 D-7251 Weissach / DE | [1986/51] | Application number, filing date | 86103460.1 | 14.03.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | DE19853514154 | 19.04.1985 Original published format: DE 3514154 | [1986/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0204898 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204898 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/22, G01B7/14 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
G01P3/49 (EP);
G01D5/2216 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/51] | Title | German: | Berührungsfreies Messverfahren und Messvorrichtung | [1989/33] | English: | Contactless test method and measuring device | [1989/33] | French: | Méthode de test sans contact et dispositif de mesure | [1989/33] |
Former [1986/51] | Berührungsfreies Messverfahren | ||
Former [1986/51] | Contactless test method | ||
Former [1986/51] | Méthode de test sans contact | Examination procedure | 19.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.1990
17.10.1990
ADMISSIBLE Messerschmitt - Bölkow - Blohm GmbH, Ottobrunn Patente Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse, Tor 1 D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [1990/28] | 24.10.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.01.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.02.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 21.02.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.05.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.05.1991 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2635288 [ ] (FEINPRUEF FEINMESS UND PRUEFGE); | DE3242109 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |