Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] |
08.09.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.10.1990 [1990/43] |
09.08.1988 | First examination report | |
19.08.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.10.1987 [1987/41] |
28.04.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 16.06.1987 [1987/25] |
24.04.1987 | Change - classification | published on 10.06.1987 [1987/24] |
09.08.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.09.1986 [1986/39] |