EP0195393 - Differential actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mohri, Naotake 3837-3, Shimada Kuroishi Tenpaku-cho Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states Mohri, Naotake 3837-3, Shimada Kuroishi Tenpaku-cho Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohri, Naotake 3837-3, Shimada Kuroishi Tenpakucho Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 02 /
Saito, Nagao c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Miura, Kuniharu c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Nagoya Works 1-14, Yada Minami 5-chome Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 04 /
Yanai, Yoshihiko c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Nagoya Works 1-14, Yada Minami 5-chome Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103533.5 | 15.03.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | JP19850055069 | 19.03.1985 Original published format: JP 5506985 | JP19850055070 | 19.03.1985 Original published format: JP 5507085 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0195393 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0195393 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195393 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/72, F16H1/40, H02K7/10 | [1987/24] | CPC: |
F16H3/72 (EP,KR,US);
B25J11/00 (KR);
F16H3/724 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/39] | F16H3/72 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1986/39] | Title | German: | Differentialantrieb | [1986/39] | English: | Differential actuator | [1986/39] | French: | Entraînement différentiel | [1986/39] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 12.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 29.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE335176 [ ] (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE STERKRADE, et al); | DE356516 [ ] (NICOLAE ILIESCU BRANCENI); | FR986538 [ ] |