EP0196542 - Method and device for making a reinforcing cage for reinforced-concrete building elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keller, Hubert Fasanenweg 10 D-7965 Ostrach 1 / DE | [1986/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/41] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
Former [1986/41] | Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth Seestrasse 42 D-88214 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103642.4 | 18.03.1986 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | DE19853511824 | 30.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3511824 | [1986/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0196542 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0196542 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B21F27/20 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
E04C5/0604 (EP);
B21F27/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Armierungskorbes für Stahlbetonbauteile | [1986/41] | English: | Method and device for making a reinforcing cage for reinforced-concrete building elements | [1986/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'une cage d'armature pour des éléments de construction en béton armé | [1986/41] | File destroyed: | 19.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/47] | 28.06.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.03.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE468401 ; | [X]DE428913 ; | [X]US2861602 ; | [X]US2786127 ; | [X]US1878760 ; | [X]FR551445 ; | [X]FR649891 ; | [X]US1365015 ; | [A]US1871751 ; | [AD]DE3000605 ; | [AP]DE3422099 |