EP0199082 - Device for covering fuse holders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg D-35745 Herborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagener, Hans Rittershauser Strasse 14 D-6344 Dietzhölztal 2 / DE | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103652.3 | 18.03.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | DE19850011030U | 16.04.1985 Original published format: DE 8511030 U | [1986/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199082 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199082 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199082 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H85/20, H02B1/18 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
H01H85/2045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Abdecken von Sicherungshaltern | [1986/44] | English: | Device for covering fuse holders | [1986/44] | French: | Dispositif pour couvrir des supports de fusibles | [1986/44] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 14.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.06.1991 | GB | 12.06.1991 | IT | 12.06.1991 | NL | 12.06.1991 | SE | 12.06.1991 | FR | 31.10.1991 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 12.06.1991 | |
GB | 12.06.1991 | ||
IT | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
FR | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/25] | BE | 12.06.1991 | |
GB | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
FR | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/18] | BE | 12.06.1991 | |
GB | 12.06.1991 | ||
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/16] | GB | 12.06.1991 | |
NL | 12.06.1991 | ||
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/05] | NL | 12.06.1991 | |
SE | 12.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | SE | 12.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH335329 (GARDY PARTICIP APP [CH]); | [Y]DE6807774U (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]); | [AD]EP0122422 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK [DE]) |