EP0196571 - Photosensitive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki City, Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Toshiaki 1660, Sakazu Kurashiki-city / JP | 02 /
Yamauchi, Junnosuke 1652-2, Sakazu Kurashiki-city / JP | 03 /
Okaya, Takuji 2-46, Umegaoka Nagaokakyo-city / JP | [1986/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86103864.4 | 21.03.1986 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | JP19850059141 | 22.03.1985 Original published format: JP 5914185 | [1986/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0196571 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196571 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/68 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
C08F261/04 (EP,US);
G03F7/033 (EP,US);
Y10S430/106 (EP,US);
Y10S430/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/41] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche Zusammensetzung | [1986/41] | English: | Photosensitive composition | [1986/41] | French: | Composition sensible à la lumière | [1986/41] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 03.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP59189114 ; | [A]EP0010690 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]US3936530 (MORGAN CHARLES R); | [A]EP0124782 (KURARAY CO [JP]) | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 22, June 1985, page 15, abstract no. 185710x, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 59 189 114 (KURARAY CO., LTD.) 26-10-1984 (Cat. A), & JP59189114 A 00000000 |