blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0196587

EP0196587 - Method for improving color fastness [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.1990
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.1990 [1990/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NITTO BOSEKI CO., LTD.
1 Aza Higashi Gonome Fukushima-shi
Fukushima-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1986/41]For all designated states
NITTO BOSEKI CO., LTD.
1 Aza Higashi Gonome
Fukushima-shi Fukushima-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ueda, Toshio
17-19, Saikon-2-chome
Koriyama-shi / JP
02 / Kageno, Kenji
81-1, Aza Atago Kubota
Fukuyamamachi Koriyama-shi / JP
03 / Harada, Susumu
9-4, Koenjiminami-5-chome
Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP
[1986/41]
Representative(s)Eitle, Werner, et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/41]Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date86103994.924.03.1986
[1986/41]
Priority number, dateJP1985006879501.04.1985         Original published format: JP 6879585
[1986/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0196587
Date:08.10.1986
Language:EN
[1986/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0196587
Date:13.05.1987
Language:EN
[1987/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0196587
Date:08.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.1987
ClassificationIPC:D06P5/08, // D06M15/227, C08F26/02, C08F226/02
[1986/41]
CPC:
D06M15/3562 (EP,US); D06M15/227 (KR); D06P5/08 (EP,US);
Y10S8/918 (US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1986/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Lichtechtheit[1986/41]
English:Method for improving color fastness[1986/41]
French:Procédé pour améliorer la solidité de teinture[1986/41]
Examination procedure15.09.1987Examination requested  [1987/46]
12.07.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.05.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.1989Fee for grant paid
21.07.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
03.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP5831185  ;
 [A]JP5936788  ;
 [A]JP81128382  ;
 [A]JP59100776  ;
 [YP]EP0142337  (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD [JP])
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 14, October 1983, page 70, abstract no. 106710r, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 31 185 (NITTO BOSEKI CO., LTD.) 23-02-1983, & JP5831185 A 00000000
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 6, August 1984, page 64, abstract no. 39771f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 36 788 (NIKKA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD.) 29-02-1984, & JP5936788 A 00000000
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, no. 26, June 1982, page 81, abstract no. 219207p, Columbus, Ohio, US;
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, no. 4, January 1982, page 58, abstract no. 21247h, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-81 128 382 (NIPPON SENKA KOGYO CO., LTD.) 07-10-1981, & JP81128382 A 00000000
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 24, December 1984, page 63, abstract no 212608h, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 100 776 (NIPPON KAYAKU CO., LTD.) 11-06-1984, & JP59100776 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.